BASS | BRADDON | DENISON | FRANKLIN | LYONS | ||||||
1 |
O'Byrne ALP |
Green ALP |
Putt** Tas. Greens |
Lennon* ALP |
Polley ALP |
|||||
2 |
Cox ALP |
Rockcliff Liberal |
Hodgman M Liberal |
Hodgman W Liberal |
Llewellyn ALP |
|||||
3 |
Gutwein Liberal |
Kons ALP |
Bartlett ALP |
McKim Tas. Greens |
Hidding Liberal |
|||||
4 |
Napier Liberal |
Best ALP |
Singh ALP |
Giddings ALP |
Butler ALP |
|||||
5 |
Booth Tas. Greens |
Whiteley Liberal |
Sturges ALP |
Wriedt*** ALP |
Morris Tas. Greens |
*Note: | Ross Butler was elected at the recount conducted on 10 June 2008, which was required following the resignation of Paul Lennon on 27 May 2008. |
**Note: | Cassy O'Connor was elected at the recount conducted on 21 July 2008, which was required following the resignation of Peg Putt on 7 July 2008. |
***Note: | Daniel Hulme was elected at the recount conducted on 2 February 2009, which was required following the resignation of Paula Wriedt on 19 January 2009. |